IL HB4501 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, the General Assembly shall, by joint resolution, establish a revenue estimate for the following State fiscal year by April 30th of each year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA-REVENUE ESTIMATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseTabled
2018-04-13HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5
2018-04-13HouseMotion Do Not Pass Executive Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-12HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-04-11HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Executive Committee; Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25108New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback