IL HB4499 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Public Duty Rule Codification Act. Contains legislative findings and a statement of legislative purpose. Provides that a local governmental entity and its employees owe no duty of care to individual members of the general public to provide governmental services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC DUTY RULE CODIFICATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback