IL HB4495 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Vocational Academy Opportunity Act. Creates 2 vocational academies, one located in Cook County and the other in St. Clair County, which shall be residential institutions. Provides that each academy shall be a State agency, funded by State appropriations, private contributions, and endowments. Provides that the academies shall be governed by a single Board of Trustees for the collective operation and oversight of the academies. Provides for the membership of the Board. Specifies the duties and powers of the Board. Provides that each academy shall be empowered to lease or purchase real and personal property on commercially reasonable terms for the use by the academy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VOCATIONAL OPPORTUNITY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 006-003-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-003-000
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback