IL HB4492 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012, the Unified Code of Corrections, and the County Jail Act. Permits currently employed and qualified retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers to carry their own firearms off-duty without being in violation of the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes if they meet certain training requirements. Provides that currently employed and qualified retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers shall carry a photographic identification and a valid annual firearm certificate while carrying their own firearms off-duty. Limited to correctional officers who have custody and control over inmates in an adult correctional facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CORRECTIONAL OFFICER-FIREARMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73012526.1New CodeSee Bill Text
73053-2-12New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback