IL HB4489 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Court of Claims from the General Revenue Fund for the payment of a specified claim. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
$COURT CLAIMS
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Rep. Nathan Reitz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4489&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB4489.pdf |