IL HB4488 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no registration fee for gold star license plates shall be required from a surviving widow, widower, or parent of a person who served in the Armed Forces of the United States and lost his or her life while in service.
Title
GOLD STAR PLATES-FAMILY MEMBER
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Nathan Reitz [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-664 | Amended Code | Citation Text |