IL HB4476 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person cited for violating the Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance for which the violation is a petty offense shall not be required to sign the citation. Provides that Illinois Supreme Court Rules shall govern bail and appearance procedures when a person who is a resident of another state that is not a member of the Nonresident Violator Compact of 1977 is cited for violating this Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance. Repeals a provision governing the procedures for citations issued by a police officer in this State to a resident of another state that is a member of the Nonresident Violator Compact of 1977. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-NONRESIDENT-CITATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Transportation; 012-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-711Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-306.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
62556-308Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-803Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback