IL HB4471 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, beginning on January 1, 2019 or as soon thereafter as is practical, to offer a special instant scratch-off game to benefit police memorials. Provides that the net revenue from that game shall be divided equally for distribution into the Chicago Police Memorial Foundation Fund, the Police Memorial Committee Fund, and the Illinois State Police Memorial Fund and shall be used to fund grants for building and maintaining memorials and parks; holding annual memorial commemorations; giving scholarships to children of officers killed or catastrophically injured in the line of duty, or those interested in pursuing a career in law enforcement; and providing financial assistance to police officers and their families when a police officer is killed or injured in the line of duty. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Defines "net revenue". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE MEMORIALS SCRATCH-OFF

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Finance Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016052Amended CodeCitation Text
20160520Amended CodeCitation Text
20160521.10New CodeSee Bill Text
2016059.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback