IL HB4471 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, beginning on January 1, 2019 or as soon thereafter as is practical, to offer a special instant scratch-off game to benefit police memorials. Provides that the net revenue from that game shall be divided equally for distribution into the Chicago Police Memorial Foundation Fund, the Police Memorial Committee Fund, and the Illinois State Police Memorial Fund and shall be used to fund grants for building and maintaining memorials and parks; holding annual memorial commemorations; giving scholarships to children of officers killed or catastrophically injured in the line of duty, or those interested in pursuing a career in law enforcement; and providing financial assistance to police officers and their families when a police officer is killed or injured in the line of duty. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Defines "net revenue". Effective immediately.
Title
POLICE MEMORIALS SCRATCH-OFF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 21.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |