IL HB4467 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. In a Section concerning a police officer or fire officer survivor grant, provides that, with respect to disabled police and fire officers, natural children need not be born before the disability occurred in order to receive the grant. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-POLICE/FIRE GRANT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-001
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-23HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
2018-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094755Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback