IL HB4467 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the General Assembly for its FY10 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2009.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$GEN ASSEMBLY-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-19 - House - Motion in House (Y: 70 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-01-11 Session Sine Die
2009-12-01 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2009-05-19 Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 070-046-000
2009-05-18 Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2009-05-12 Assigned to Executive Committee
2009-05-12 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-05-12 First Reading
2009-05-12 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback