IL HB4464 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Includes catalytic converters in the definition of "essential parts". Provides that the Secretary of State shall release personally identifying information and highly restricted personal information on vehicle files, registration files, and disabled parking placards and plates files only to specified individuals. Adds licensed salvage dealers to the list of persons to whom a salvage certificate may be assigned. Provides that a registration permit for 90 days may be provided for a fee of $27 (instead of $13, plus 1/10 of the flat weight tax). Provides that, if prior military service is required as a condition for the issuance of a special license plate, an applicant who served in the armed forces or, if applicable, the surviving spouse of a deceased person who served in the armed forces, shall be eligible for a special license plate only if the armed forces member was discharged or separated under honorable conditions. Provides that antique vehicle and expanded-use antique vehicle plates may be issued only to vehicles used for noncommercial purposes. Provides that a municipality or county may issue a fine, penalty, or suspension for a vehicular standing or parking violation, a vehicle compliance violation, an automated traffic law violation, or an automated speed enforcement system violation only for a violation that occurred after January 1, 2003.
Title
VEH CD–SOS-VEHICLE SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 2-123.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4464&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4464.htm |