IL HB4442 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code and the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. Requires a school district to include in its curriculum a unit of instruction on parenting education for grades 9 through 12 that includes, but is not limited to, instruction on (i) family structure, function, and management, (ii) the prevention of child abuse, (iii) the physical, mental, emotional, social, economic, and psychological aspects of interpersonal and family relationships, and (iv) parenting education competency development that is aligned to the emotional and learning standards of the student's grade level. Provides that this instruction is a prerequisite to receiving a high school diploma and shall be included in the Comprehensive Health Education Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PARENTING EDUCATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-002-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-25SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-25SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-018-000
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseRemains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-07HouseTo SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051103Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-22Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-23.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback