IL HB4440 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall provide facilities with educational information on all vaccines recommended by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention's Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices, including, but not limited to, the risks associated with shingles and how to protect oneself against the varicella-zoster virus. Requires a facility to distribute the information to each resident who requests the information and each newly admitted resident. Allows the facility to distribute the information to residents electronically. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NURSING HOMES-VACCINE INFO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-03-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210452-213Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback