IL HB4437 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that by July 1, 2022, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services may provide medical services to noncitizens 19 years of age through 54 years of age who (i) are not eligible for medical assistance under the Code due to their not meeting the otherwise applicable provisions under the Code concerning citizenship requirements and (ii) have income at or below 133% of the federal poverty level plus 5% for the applicable family size as determined under applicable federal law and regulations. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
MEDICAL SERVICES-NONCITIZENS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4437&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4437.htm |