IL HB4433 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Provides for transfers from certain listed funds into the Audit Expense Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUDIT EXPENSE FUND TRANSFERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-006-000
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 008-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301056z-27Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback