IL HB4429 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Parks Act. Requires all persons or entities seeking to charge fees to participants, provide items for sale, or otherwise collect money or items as part of an event located on property or facilities that are owned, leased, or managed by the Department of Natural Resources to complete a permit to sell application form to obtain a permit to sell. Provides that all revenue generated from an event shall be subject to a 10% fee payable to the Department of Natural Resources upon completion of the event. Requires all funds received by the Department to be allocated to the site at which the fees were collected. Waives activity permit fees, permit to sell fees, and facility usage fees for formally recognized Friends Groups and for all fishing tournaments and clubs. Effective immediately.
Title
DNR-STATE PARKS/PERMIT TO SELL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-01-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4429&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4429.htm |