IL HB4429 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Currency Exchange Act. Requires that an applicant for a license to operate a currency exchange must provide a statement that the business is in good standing with the State of Illinois and in compliance with the Department of Revenue. Repeals a provision that allows community currency exchanges and ambulatory currency exchanges to engage in distribution of Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits and a provision that prohibits community currency exchanges and ambulatory currency exchanges from issuing tokens to be used instead of money for the purchase of goods or services from any enterprise.
Title
CURRENCY EXCHANGE ACT-LICENSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 405 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 405 | 3.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 405 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4429&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4429.htm |