IL HB4428 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for taxpayers who are employed as law enforcement officers in an amount equal to 100% of the unreimbursed expenses paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year for: (1) professional certifications required for the performance of the taxpayer's duties as a law enforcement officer; (2) equipment used by the taxpayer in the performance of his or her duties as a law enforcement officer; and (3) mental health training. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-POLICE TRAINING CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4428&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4428.htm |