IL HB4428 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grade A Pasteurized Milk and Milk Products Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health or a unit of local government electing to administer and enforce the Act shall provide a dairy farm with a paper copy of the dairy farm's inspection report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MILK INSPECTIONS-PAPER COPIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-20HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0618
2018-07-20HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-07-20HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41063510Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback