IL HB4416 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Transportation Network Providers Act. Provides that an individual applying to become a transportation network company driver shall include in the application his or her full name and any used nicknames or aliases. Provides that an individual who submits an application that contains false or incomplete information shall be guilty of a petty offense. Provides that a transportation network company shall not permit an individual to act as a transportation network company driver on its digital platform if the individual has been placed on court supervision, within the past 7 years, for driving under the influence of drugs or alcohol. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANS NET PROVIDER-DRIVER APP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6255715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback