IL HB4416 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Transportation Network Providers Act. Provides that an individual applying to become a transportation network company driver shall include in the application his or her full name and any used nicknames or aliases. Provides that an individual who submits an application that contains false or incomplete information shall be guilty of a petty offense. Provides that a transportation network company shall not permit an individual to act as a transportation network company driver on its digital platform if the individual has been placed on court supervision, within the past 7 years, for driving under the influence of drugs or alcohol. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
TRANS NET PROVIDER-DRIVER APP
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0738 |
2018-08-07 | House | Effective Date August 7, 2018 |
2018-08-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 57 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |