IL HB4415 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. With respect to the awarding of contracts by boards of trustees of community college districts, deletes the prohibition on electronic bid submissions for construction purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COM COL-CONTRACT BID-CONSTRUCT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-04-19HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2024-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2024-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2024-01-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108053-27.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback