IL HB4415 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the exemption for coal and aggregate exploration, mining, off-highway hauling, processing, maintenance, and reclamation equipment sunsets on June 30, 2023 (currently, the exemption is subject to the Acts' automatic sunset provisions). Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-COAL SUNSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0594 |
2018-06-29 | House | Effective Date June 29, 2018 |
2018-06-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-02-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |