IL HB4414 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees, State Universities, and Downstate Teachers Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, appointments to the position of executive director or chief investment officer must be made with the advice and consent of the Senate. Amends the Chicago Teachers Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, appointments to the position of executive director, chief investment officer, or chief legal officer must be made with the advice and consent of the Senate. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-EXEC DIR & CIO-APPTMNT
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-01 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-135.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-140.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4414&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4414.htm |