IL HB4413 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that any open meeting of the board of trustees of a retirement system or pension fund or any committee established by a retirement system or pension fund must be broadcast to the public and maintained in real-time on the retirement system's or pension fund's website using a high-speed Internet connection. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-BROADCAST MEETINGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-039-001
2018-04-18HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-002-001
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
4051-113.16Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback