IL HB4412 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Outdoor Rx Program Act. Creates the Outside Rx Program to provide funds, through grants established by the Department of Public Health, for outdoor environmental, ecological, agricultural, or other natural resource or outdoor-based therapy programs serving the citizens of the State of Illinois. Requires the Department to establish an advisory committee to assist and advise the Department in the development and administration of the Outdoor Rx Program, including developing the form for an application for receipt of a grant. Provides that the Department shall set priorities and develop criteria for the awarding of grants to natural resource or outdoor-based therapy programs. Provides criteria for grant eligibility and selection. Provides that the Director of Public Health shall make the final decision on funding a program. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Outdoor Rx Program Fund as a special fund in the State treasury.
Title
OUTDOOR RX PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |