IL HB4412 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the Board shall make best efforts to ensure that the racial and ethnic makeup of the System's senior administrative staff represents the racial and ethnic makeup of the System's membership. Provides that "senior administrative staff" includes, but is not limited to, the Executive Director, the Chief Investment Officer, the General Counsel and Freedom of Information Officer, the Chief Financial Officer, the Director of Member Services, the Director of Outreach, the Director of Human Resources, the Director of Internal Audit, the Director of Operations, and the Director of Application Development and Research. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-SURS-SENIOR ADMIN STAFF

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 85 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Motion in House (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 085-018-001
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-001-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018
2018-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-026-005
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseMotion Lost 059-050-000
2018-04-17HouseNote / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-17HousePension Note Filed
2018-04-16HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-005-000
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40515-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback