IL HB4411 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a retirement system or investment board created under the State Employee, State Universities, Downstate Teachers, Chicago Teachers, or the Board of Investment Article may not enter into a contract for lobbying services with a lobbyist who represents another retirement system or investment board created under one of those Articles. Defines "lobbying" and "lobbyist". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-LOBBYING CONTRACTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-109.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback