IL HB4407 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With respect to age-appropriate developmental screening and age-appropriate social and emotional screening, provides that the Department of Public Health must, no later than January 1, 2019, develop rules and appropriate revisions to the Child Health Examination form in conjunction with various organizations. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DEPT PUBLIC HEALTH-RULE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-02-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4407&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4407.htm |