IL HB4406 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that the licensing standards for day care centers and day care homes shall include a requirement that such facilities adopt policies regarding immunizations for day care staff, and that the most current recommendations of the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices may be used as a guideline in adopting such policies. Further provides that the licensing standards shall include exemptions for day care staff who object to immunization on religious grounds or for clinical reasons. Effective immediately.
Title
DAY CARE - STAFF IMMUNIZATIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4406&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4406.htm |