IL HB4405 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom from Drone Surveillance Act. Provides an exemption to the Act for a law enforcement agency that is using a drone to prepare for or monitor safety and security at a large-scale event, if drone usage is limited to legitimate public safety purposes, including, but not limited to, evaluating crowd size, density, or movement, assessing public safety vulnerabilities or weaknesses, determining appropriate staffing levels for law enforcement or other public safety personnel, or identifying possible criminal activity. Defines "large-scale event". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DRONE USE-LARGE EVENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72516715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback