IL HB4404 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Residential Mortgage License Act of 1987. Provides that "soliciting, processing, placing, or negotiating a residential mortgage loan" excludes independent loan processing as permitted by the federal Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RES MORTGAGE-LOAN PROCESSING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0851
2018-08-14HouseEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 005-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-09HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056351-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback