IL HB4404 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Residential Mortgage License Act of 1987. Provides that "soliciting, processing, placing, or negotiating a residential mortgage loan" excludes independent loan processing as permitted by the federal Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008.
Title
RES MORTGAGE-LOAN PROCESSING
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0851 |
2018-08-14 | House | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 635 | 1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |