IL HB4403 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Provides that the Director of the Division of Financial Institutions of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may accept an examination of a credit union made by the credit union's share insurer as an alternative to the biennial examination of a credit union conducted by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation or a public accountant registered by the Department.
Title
CREDIT UNION ACT-BIENNIAL EXAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4403&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4403.htm |