IL HB4401 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of In God We Trust special license plate decals by the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs. Provides that $11 of each original issuance and $24 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Illinois Veterans' Homes Fund, and that $15 of each original issuance and $2 of each renewal shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-IN GOD WE TRUST PLATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-699.14Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback