IL HB4395 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Removes the prohibition on a candidate for elective office who is required to file a statement of economic interests in relation to his or her candidacy from using the Internet to file his or her statement of economic interests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-INTERNET BASED FILING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Chad Hays
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-16HouseArrived in House
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 013-000-000
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; Rep. Chad Hays
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54204A-108Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback