IL HB4392 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-7)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall require every provider of mammography services to, if a patient's mammogram demonstrates dense breast tissue, provide notification to the patient in any summary of the mammography report sent to the patient pursuant to the federal Mammography Quality Standards Act that shall include, but not be limited to, certain information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-MAMMOGRAPHY INFORMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-697New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback