IL HB4390 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Defines "commercial property", "dangerous condition", "first responder", "management or operational control", "person", and "serious bodily injury". Provides that first responder endangerment is committed when a person knowingly creates a dangerous situation and intentionally conceals the dangerous condition in a commercial property under his or her management or control and the dangerous condition is the primary cause of death or serious bodily injury of a first responder during the course of his or her official duties. Provides that first responder endangerment is a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-CRIMINAL BUILDING MGMT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2018-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-5.1bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback