IL HB4390 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Defines "commercial property", "dangerous condition", "first responder", "management or operational control", "person", and "serious bodily injury". Provides that first responder endangerment is committed when a person knowingly creates a dangerous situation and intentionally conceals the dangerous condition in a commercial property under his or her management or control and the dangerous condition is the primary cause of death or serious bodily injury of a first responder during the course of his or her official duties. Provides that first responder endangerment is a Class 4 felony.
Title
CRIM CD-CRIMINAL BUILDING MGMT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-18 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Re-assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |