IL HB4388 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, for license renewals occurring on or after January 1, 2023, Emergency Medical Services personnel must complete at least one one-hour course of training on the diagnosis, treatment, and care of individuals with Alzheimer's disease or other dementias per license renewal period. Contains training requirements. Provides that completion of the course may count toward meeting minimum credit hours required for relicensure requirements. Provides that specified training may count toward the continuing education required under the amendatory provisions. Provides that the Department of Public Health may adopt rules for the implementation of the amendatory provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
DPH-EMS-ALZHEIMER TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0772 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-011-002 |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-02-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 006-002-000 |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |