IL HB4384 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Extends the authorization for advance deposit wagering to December 31, 2022 (rather than December 31, 2018). Effective immediately.
Title
GAMING-ADVANCE DEPOSIT WAGER
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Executive Committee; Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-10 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2018-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 5 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 5 | 26.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 5 | 26.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 5 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4384&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4384.htm |