IL HB4383 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that disenrollment of a Medicaid enrollee from a managed care organization under contract with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall be in accordance with specified federal requirements whenever a contract is terminated between a Medicaid managed care health plan and a primary care provider that results in a disruption to the Medicaid enrollee's provider-beneficiary relationship. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MCO-DISENROLLMENT REQUIREMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-03-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-001
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-30.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback