IL HB4383 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-14)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0950
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-14)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0950
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that disenrollment of a Medicaid enrollee from a managed care organization under contract with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall be in accordance with specified federal requirements whenever a contract is terminated between a Medicaid managed care health plan and a primary care provider that results in a disruption to the Medicaid enrollee's provider-beneficiary relationship. Effective immediately.
Title
MCO-DISENROLLMENT REQUIREMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0950 |
2018-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2018 |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-001 |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |