IL HB4380 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that no owner of a dog or cat that is a companion animal may expose the dog or cat in a manner that places the dog or cat in a life-threatening situation for a prolonged period of time in extreme heat of 100 degrees Fahrenheit or above or cold conditions of 20 degrees Fahrenheit or below that could: (1) result in injury to or death of the animal; or (2) result in hypothermia, hyperthermia, frostbite, or similar condition as diagnosed by a doctor of veterinary medicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOG OR CAT-EXTREME WEATHER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-002-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510703.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback