IL HB4379 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Removes the penalty of $100 per day for members of a board or commission that functions solely in an advisory capacity and does not issue binding recommendations or determinations for failing to file a statement of economic interest by a specified time period.
Title
ETHICS-ECON INTERESTS STATEMNT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-039-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 4A-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |