IL HB4376 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that various added sentences of imprisonment for committing offenses while armed with a firearm or by personally discharging a firearm are discretionary and constitute the maximum sentences that may be imposed by the court.
Title
CRIM CD&CORR-FIREARM SENTENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-02-19 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 10-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-1.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 18-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 18-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 19-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 33A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 9-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4376&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4376.htm |