IL HB4376 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Motion Withdrawn Rep. Peter Breen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. In a Section concerning a college savings pool, provides that moneys may be used for qualified expenses allowed pursuant to Section 529 of the Internal Revenue Code. Provides that, before January 1, 2026, the Treasurer shall allow a rollover of funds contained in a College Savings Pool account into an eligible ABLE account. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-03-01HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550516.5Amended CodeCitation Text
1550516.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback