IL HB4375 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Local Government Email Act. Provides that all emails that are in connection with the transaction of public business sent or received by a unit of local government or school district or an employee, staff member, trustee, board member, elected official, or officer of a unit of local government or school district are public records regardless if the emails are sent or received on a personal or unit-provided or district-provided email address. Requires a unit of local government or school district that provides an email address to one or more of its employees, staff members, trustees, board members, elected officials, or officers to provide an email address for all employees, staff members, trustees, board members, elected officials, and officers of the unit of local government or school district. Provides that employees, staff members, trustees, board members, elected officials, or officers shall use unit-provided or district-provided email for all communications in connection with the transaction of public business. Provides that employees, staff members, trustees, board members, elected officials, or officers shall promptly forward, print, or otherwise provide any email sent or received on his or her personal email address to his or her unit of local government or school district if the email is in connection with the transaction of public business. Provides that if an email received on a personal email was carbon copied to a unit-provided and controlled or district-provided and controlled email, a copy of the email does not need to be provided to the unit or district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT EMAIL ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback