IL HB4373 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes DuPage county, and the municipalities located within it, from provisions regarding the applicability of a Section under the Code concerning automated traffic law enforcement systems.
Title
VEH CD-RED LIGHT CAMERA-DUPAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | To Red Light Camera Subcommittee |
2018-02-14 | House | Re-assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4373&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4373.htm |